California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1580 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Amended

Bill July 1, 2019
Bill June 18, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019
Bill March 28, 2019