California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1584 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill August 13, 2019
Bill June 25, 2019
Bill May 1, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019