California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1596 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill June 6, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019