|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 585, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/24/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 42. Noes 28. Page 3411.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2773.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 27. Page 1789.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|