Assembly | 02/03/2020 | Died on third reading file. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.) | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2019 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |