Senate
|
07/07/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3937.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2020
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2020
|
(pending re-refer to Com. on B. & P.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2020
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3769.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|