California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1618 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill July 5, 2019
Bill June 13, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019