Assembly | 01/27/2020 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 34. Noes 11. Page 3912.). | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2020 | Reconsideration granted. (Page 3887.) | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2019 | January 23-Motion to reconsider continued. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | Motion to reconsider on the next legislative day made by Assembly Member Kiley. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2019 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 37. Noes 16. Page 1594.). | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2019 | Read first time. To print. |