|
09/27/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 360, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 3115.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2504.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 1632.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|