Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 01/21/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3848.) | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (January 8). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |