|
07/31/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 168, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/31/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2054.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1830.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|