|
10/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 788, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/18/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 2696.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 1904.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|