Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2019
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2243.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1987.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|