California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1669 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2019

Amended

Bill June 20, 2019
Bill May 24, 2019
Bill May 20, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019