California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1671 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2019

Amended

Bill June 26, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019