Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1907.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|