|
10/08/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 561, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/23/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 2853.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 2. Page 1573.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|