California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1707 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 09/16/2019

                    Enrolled  September 16, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  September 11, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  May 09, 2019 Amended IN  Assembly  March 19, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1707Introduced by Assembly Member BermanFebruary 22, 2019 An act to add Section 2302 to the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1707, Berman. Polling places: handheld devices.Existing law sets forth various restrictions relating to permissible conduct at polling places, including, among others, that a person is prohibited from photographing, video recording, or otherwise recording a voter entering or exiting a polling place with the intent of dissuading another person from voting, as specified.This bill would provide that a voter or any other person may not be prohibited from using an electronic device, including a smartphone, tablet, or other handheld device, at a polling place provided that the use of the device does not result in a violation of other provisions of law.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 2302 is added to the Elections Code, to read:2302. A voter or any other person shall not be prohibited from using an electronic device, including a smartphone, tablet, or other handheld device, at a polling place provided that the use of the device does not result in a violation of Section 14221, 14224, 14291, 18370, 18502, 18540, 18541, or any other provision of this code.

 Enrolled  September 16, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  September 11, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  May 09, 2019 Amended IN  Assembly  March 19, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 1707Introduced by Assembly Member BermanFebruary 22, 2019 An act to add Section 2302 to the Elections Code, relating to elections. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 1707, Berman. Polling places: handheld devices.Existing law sets forth various restrictions relating to permissible conduct at polling places, including, among others, that a person is prohibited from photographing, video recording, or otherwise recording a voter entering or exiting a polling place with the intent of dissuading another person from voting, as specified.This bill would provide that a voter or any other person may not be prohibited from using an electronic device, including a smartphone, tablet, or other handheld device, at a polling place provided that the use of the device does not result in a violation of other provisions of law.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 

 Enrolled  September 16, 2019 Passed IN  Senate  September 11, 2019 Passed IN  Assembly  May 09, 2019 Amended IN  Assembly  March 19, 2019

Enrolled  September 16, 2019
Passed IN  Senate  September 11, 2019
Passed IN  Assembly  May 09, 2019
Amended IN  Assembly  March 19, 2019

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

 Assembly Bill 

No. 1707

Introduced by Assembly Member BermanFebruary 22, 2019

Introduced by Assembly Member Berman
February 22, 2019

 An act to add Section 2302 to the Elections Code, relating to elections. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 1707, Berman. Polling places: handheld devices.

Existing law sets forth various restrictions relating to permissible conduct at polling places, including, among others, that a person is prohibited from photographing, video recording, or otherwise recording a voter entering or exiting a polling place with the intent of dissuading another person from voting, as specified.This bill would provide that a voter or any other person may not be prohibited from using an electronic device, including a smartphone, tablet, or other handheld device, at a polling place provided that the use of the device does not result in a violation of other provisions of law.

Existing law sets forth various restrictions relating to permissible conduct at polling places, including, among others, that a person is prohibited from photographing, video recording, or otherwise recording a voter entering or exiting a polling place with the intent of dissuading another person from voting, as specified.

This bill would provide that a voter or any other person may not be prohibited from using an electronic device, including a smartphone, tablet, or other handheld device, at a polling place provided that the use of the device does not result in a violation of other provisions of law.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 2302 is added to the Elections Code, to read:2302. A voter or any other person shall not be prohibited from using an electronic device, including a smartphone, tablet, or other handheld device, at a polling place provided that the use of the device does not result in a violation of Section 14221, 14224, 14291, 18370, 18502, 18540, 18541, or any other provision of this code.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 2302 is added to the Elections Code, to read:2302. A voter or any other person shall not be prohibited from using an electronic device, including a smartphone, tablet, or other handheld device, at a polling place provided that the use of the device does not result in a violation of Section 14221, 14224, 14291, 18370, 18502, 18540, 18541, or any other provision of this code.

SECTION 1. Section 2302 is added to the Elections Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

2302. A voter or any other person shall not be prohibited from using an electronic device, including a smartphone, tablet, or other handheld device, at a polling place provided that the use of the device does not result in a violation of Section 14221, 14224, 14291, 18370, 18502, 18540, 18541, or any other provision of this code.

2302. A voter or any other person shall not be prohibited from using an electronic device, including a smartphone, tablet, or other handheld device, at a polling place provided that the use of the device does not result in a violation of Section 14221, 14224, 14291, 18370, 18502, 18540, 18541, or any other provision of this code.

2302. A voter or any other person shall not be prohibited from using an electronic device, including a smartphone, tablet, or other handheld device, at a polling place provided that the use of the device does not result in a violation of Section 14221, 14224, 14291, 18370, 18502, 18540, 18541, or any other provision of this code.



2302. A voter or any other person shall not be prohibited from using an electronic device, including a smartphone, tablet, or other handheld device, at a polling place provided that the use of the device does not result in a violation of Section 14221, 14224, 14291, 18370, 18502, 18540, 18541, or any other provision of this code.