|
01/21/2020
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2019
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 3500.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2856.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 1908.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|