Senate | 07/07/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 07/10/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2104.) | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2019 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2019 | Introduced. To print. |