|
10/03/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3534.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2019
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (September 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3439.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2244.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Umberg.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1588.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|