Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/14/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2020
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3910.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2019
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/23/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|