|
07/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 114, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1880.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1588.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|