Assembly
|
02/03/2020
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2020
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/01/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|