|
10/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 797, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/24/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3559.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3542.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2914.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2689.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2019.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|