Senate | 09/14/2019 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Bradford. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1473.) | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 5. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2019 | Read first time. To print. |