California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1819 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019
Bill March 28, 2019