|
10/02/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 399, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/02/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3428.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2762.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2019
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2019
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1830.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 12.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|