Senate | 09/12/2019 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2019 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2019 | From Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2019 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 07/09/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2019 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1773.) | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2019 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 21. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2019 | Read first time. To print. |