LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1833
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1833
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1833
Action History
Assembly
02/03/2020
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Assembly
01/31/2020
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
Assembly
01/06/2020
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
Assembly
09/12/2019
From printer. May be heard in committee October 12.
Assembly
09/11/2019
Introduced pursuant to Joint Rule 54.
Assembly
09/11/2019
Read first time. To print.