|
09/30/2020
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4381.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2020
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/29/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4696.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (June 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|