LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1846
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1846
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1846
Action History
Assembly
03/16/2020
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Assembly
03/11/2020
Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
Assembly
03/10/2020
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
01/17/2020
Referred to Com. on U. & E.
Assembly
01/07/2020
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
Assembly
01/06/2020
Read first time. To print.