|
09/28/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5225.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 4292.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 4753.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2020
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2020
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 6.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|