Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2019 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2019 | Read first time. To print. |