Senate | 07/01/2020 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 4869.) | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2020 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2020 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2020 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 4273.) | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2020 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2020 | Read first time. To print. |