|
07/09/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 59, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2456.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1677.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1190.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|