Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2019 | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2019 | Read first time. To print. |