California 2019 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB191 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/10/2019

                    CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 191Introduced by Assembly Member PattersonJanuary 10, 2019 An act to add and repeal Section 17951.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 191, as introduced, Patterson. Building standards: exemptions: rebuilding after disasters.Existing law, the State Housing Law, establishes statewide construction and occupancy standards for buildings used for human habitation, including energy conservation and fire prevention requirements relating to energy efficiency and the installation of interior sprinklers.This bill would, until January 1, 2030, exempt homes being rebuilt after wildfires or specified emergency events that occurred on or after January 1, 2017, from meeting certain current building standards.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a person who is rebuilding a residential dwelling that was destroyed on or after January 1, 2017, by a wildfire or by an event that led the Governor to proclaim a state of emergency, shall be afforded both of the following exemptions regarding state and local building standards:(1) The new structure shall only be required to meet the energy efficiency standards that were in place on January 1, 2006.(2) The new structure shall not be required to be built with an interior sprinkler system.(b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2030, and as of that date is repealed.

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 191Introduced by Assembly Member PattersonJanuary 10, 2019 An act to add and repeal Section 17951.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 191, as introduced, Patterson. Building standards: exemptions: rebuilding after disasters.Existing law, the State Housing Law, establishes statewide construction and occupancy standards for buildings used for human habitation, including energy conservation and fire prevention requirements relating to energy efficiency and the installation of interior sprinklers.This bill would, until January 1, 2030, exempt homes being rebuilt after wildfires or specified emergency events that occurred on or after January 1, 2017, from meeting certain current building standards.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: NO  Local Program: NO 





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 191

Introduced by Assembly Member PattersonJanuary 10, 2019

Introduced by Assembly Member Patterson
January 10, 2019

 An act to add and repeal Section 17951.7 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to building standards. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 191, as introduced, Patterson. Building standards: exemptions: rebuilding after disasters.

Existing law, the State Housing Law, establishes statewide construction and occupancy standards for buildings used for human habitation, including energy conservation and fire prevention requirements relating to energy efficiency and the installation of interior sprinklers.This bill would, until January 1, 2030, exempt homes being rebuilt after wildfires or specified emergency events that occurred on or after January 1, 2017, from meeting certain current building standards.

Existing law, the State Housing Law, establishes statewide construction and occupancy standards for buildings used for human habitation, including energy conservation and fire prevention requirements relating to energy efficiency and the installation of interior sprinklers.

This bill would, until January 1, 2030, exempt homes being rebuilt after wildfires or specified emergency events that occurred on or after January 1, 2017, from meeting certain current building standards.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 17951.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a person who is rebuilding a residential dwelling that was destroyed on or after January 1, 2017, by a wildfire or by an event that led the Governor to proclaim a state of emergency, shall be afforded both of the following exemptions regarding state and local building standards:(1) The new structure shall only be required to meet the energy efficiency standards that were in place on January 1, 2006.(2) The new structure shall not be required to be built with an interior sprinkler system.(b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2030, and as of that date is repealed.

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 17951.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a person who is rebuilding a residential dwelling that was destroyed on or after January 1, 2017, by a wildfire or by an event that led the Governor to proclaim a state of emergency, shall be afforded both of the following exemptions regarding state and local building standards:(1) The new structure shall only be required to meet the energy efficiency standards that were in place on January 1, 2006.(2) The new structure shall not be required to be built with an interior sprinkler system.(b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2030, and as of that date is repealed.

SECTION 1. Section 17951.7 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a person who is rebuilding a residential dwelling that was destroyed on or after January 1, 2017, by a wildfire or by an event that led the Governor to proclaim a state of emergency, shall be afforded both of the following exemptions regarding state and local building standards:(1) The new structure shall only be required to meet the energy efficiency standards that were in place on January 1, 2006.(2) The new structure shall not be required to be built with an interior sprinkler system.(b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2030, and as of that date is repealed.

17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a person who is rebuilding a residential dwelling that was destroyed on or after January 1, 2017, by a wildfire or by an event that led the Governor to proclaim a state of emergency, shall be afforded both of the following exemptions regarding state and local building standards:(1) The new structure shall only be required to meet the energy efficiency standards that were in place on January 1, 2006.(2) The new structure shall not be required to be built with an interior sprinkler system.(b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2030, and as of that date is repealed.

17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a person who is rebuilding a residential dwelling that was destroyed on or after January 1, 2017, by a wildfire or by an event that led the Governor to proclaim a state of emergency, shall be afforded both of the following exemptions regarding state and local building standards:(1) The new structure shall only be required to meet the energy efficiency standards that were in place on January 1, 2006.(2) The new structure shall not be required to be built with an interior sprinkler system.(b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2030, and as of that date is repealed.



17951.7. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a person who is rebuilding a residential dwelling that was destroyed on or after January 1, 2017, by a wildfire or by an event that led the Governor to proclaim a state of emergency, shall be afforded both of the following exemptions regarding state and local building standards:

(1) The new structure shall only be required to meet the energy efficiency standards that were in place on January 1, 2006.

(2) The new structure shall not be required to be built with an interior sprinkler system.

(b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2030, and as of that date is repealed.