|
09/29/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 241, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5322.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4373.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 31).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4748.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|