|
09/29/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 242, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5322.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4378.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/21/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2020
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4724.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2020
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2020
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2020
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 15.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/15/2020
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|