Senate | 07/01/2020 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Senate | 06/16/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/15/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4855.) | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2020 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3). | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2020 | Read first time. To print. |