Assembly | 05/19/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 16. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2020 | Read first time. To print. |