California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1945 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2020

Amended

Bill June 29, 2020
Bill May 4, 2020