LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1952
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1952
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1952
Action History
Assembly
02/25/2020
Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
Assembly
02/24/2020
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
02/06/2020
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and E.S. & T.M.
Assembly
01/18/2020
From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
Assembly
01/17/2020
Read first time. To print.