Senate | 08/05/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2020 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4694.). | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2020 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2020 | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 17. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2020 | Read first time. To print. |