Senate
|
09/01/2020
|
Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2020
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2020
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 7. Page 1858.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 10.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|