California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB197 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill May 17, 2019
Bill March 20, 2019