California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1976 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 22, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2020

Amended

Bill August 20, 2020
Bill August 5, 2020
Bill May 4, 2020