California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1979 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2020

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2020

Amended

Bill August 20, 2020
Bill July 28, 2020
Bill July 7, 2020
Bill June 4, 2020