Senate | 08/08/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2020 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/11/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 4821.) | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2020 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 2). | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2020 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2020 | Read first time. To print. |